Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14835 Week
» 67851 Month
» 187378 Year
» 3214231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5457 |
m/e |
10/1938 |
British Railways |
45457 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
142 |
To Service |
During 10/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/09/1963 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
26/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively. No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date. No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump |
SLS/194810 |
31/01/1950 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 45319, 45457. |
SLS/195003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5457 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45457 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45457 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|