Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 152 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1186 Week
» 23692 Month
» 326882 Year
» 1548447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5457 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45457 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Mon 16/09/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 14/03/1959
67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 26/09/1959
   Withdrawn on 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   on 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively.
No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date.
No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump
SLS/194810
31/01/1950 Inverness Lochgorm Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 45319, 45457. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5457
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45457    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
16/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 45457    

prev prev