Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 160 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 23700 Month
» 326890 Year
» 1548455 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5458 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45458 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
60A Inverness 4w/e 05/07/1958
63A Perth South 4w/e 25/10/1958
66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/11/1958
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/11/1958
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. SLS/194910
31/03/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 595, 612, 40907/11, 42208, 42415, 42738/44/57, 42805, 42916, 43973, 4183, 44801, 44956, 45085/86, 45100/16/17/56/61/64/68/92, 45356, 45458/75/80/83/89/99, 45646, 46121, 14443, 54460, 54649, 56153, 16230/33, 56240, 16241, 56263, 16288, 16322/30/47, 17265, 57272, 57311/35, 17410/44/46, 57566, 17628, 57652. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5458
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45458    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 45458    

prev prev