Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5341 Week
» 20455 Month
» 323645 Year
» 1545210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5459 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45459 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Thu 14/05/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
60A Inverness 4w/e 05/07/1958
63A Perth South 4w/e 25/10/1958
66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/11/1958
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 09/04/1960
66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/07/1960
67B Hurlford 5w/e 07/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 14/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/11/1958
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 09/04/1960
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 5w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   on 14/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 St Rollox Works The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again SLS/194804
01/10/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5459
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45459    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
14/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45459    

prev prev