Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 120 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5341 Week
» 20455 Month
» 323645 Year
» 1545210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5460 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45460 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/06/1965
Scrapping During 06/1968 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
60A Inverness 4w/e 26/10/1957
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/06/1960
67C Ayr 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 26/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 63A Perth South w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/06/1960
ALLOC 67C Ayr 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. SLS/194910
18/02/1963 Glasgow St. Rollox (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop. 42271, 42800/3, 44923/57, 45423/56/60/78/99, D3730/8, D3916, D5337/69, D5121/3, D6105/23/4/31, Test House: D3280, D6103. Paint Shop-stored: D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Ex-Works: 45357/62, 45496. Awaiting Works: 42195, 44980, D6100 fire damage, D6107/14. Works shunters. D2772, D3542. D6123 was being prepared for Paxman Works, Colchester. SLS/196303
15/03/1963 Glasgow St. Rollox (Ex-Works) Erecting Shop: 42261/71, 42912, 44791, 44931, 45127, 45309, D3209, D3346, D3563, D3916, D5121, D5325/30/42, D6102/24, D8098; awaiting works-D3008, D3881, D5348, D6107, 44979, 45319, 45423, 45498. Ex-Works: 45460, D6114. Diesel Test House: D3390, D5309, D5361; stored in paint shop-D6101/6/22/5/7/30. Works shunter: D3412. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5460
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45460    
26/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
26/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45460    

prev prev