Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 96 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5317 Week
» 20431 Month
» 323621 Year
» 1545186 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5461 m/e 10/1938
British Railways 45461 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 10/1938
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1938
28A Motherwell 4w/e 22/06/1946
28A Motherwell on 01/01/1948
63A Perth South 4w/e 30/07/1960
   Withdrawn on 22/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 60A Inverness on 24/06/1950
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 30/07/1960
WDN   on 22/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-Nos. *40667 (3778) 7/9; 42878 (4171) 5/9; 44878 (9362) 20/9; 44968 (10593) 5/9; 44979 (10604) 8/9; 45015 (9473) 29/9; 45155 (10547) 10/9; 45156 (9260) 14/9; 45169 (9169) 21/9; 45173 (9277) 15/9; 45213 (9317) 19/9; 45355 (9827) 9/9; 45366 (9602) 13/9; 45443 (9271) 6/9; *45461 (9717) 8/9; 45477 (9823) 22/9; 45478 (9824) 22/9; 45643 (10503) 19/9; *54453 (6052) 24/9; 54649 (2680) 13/9; 55166 9/9; *55159 15/9; 55201 21/9; 55212 8/9; 56340 28/9; 56368 29/9; *57247 (885) 24/9. *Retains L.M.S. on tank or tender sides. With the exception of Nos. 45461, 54453 and 54649, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number-plates. Commencing on 5/9, the colour of the numbers and letters was changed from white to cream; the original dimensions being retained. Several locomotives have been treated with a full paint schedule-three undercoats, one coat of enamel and two coats of varnish. The first to be dealt with was No. **57360 (876), which was completed in the Erecting Shop during W/E 11/9, but subsequent engines have been sent to the Varnish Shop for completion as follows:-Nos. **55233 25/9; **57236 (6029) 14/9; **57238 (990) 25/9; **57309 (947) 16/9; **57368 (6005) 23/9; **57651 (1732) 21/9. On 30/9 a new departure was made when No. **40188 received 8' numerals and 6' letters. **Fitted with new smokebox numberplates. SLS/194811
09/07/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
31/12/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. SLS/195002
30/06/1950 St. Rollox Works Engines into shops: 1131, 2276, 3868, 4884, 7168, 16321, 16329, 17278, 17322, 17367, 17634, 40688, 40924, 42217, 42877, 44701, 44886, 44970, 44976, 44992, 44996, 44997, 45009, 45084, 45125, 45162, 45432, 45453, 45461, 45463. 45465, 45564, 45692, 54480, 54484, 54488, 54491, 55126, 56346, 57329, 57456, 57580, 57592, 57625. SLS/195008
15/10/1962 Inverurie Works In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. SLS/196211
09/11/1962 Inverurie Works (Ex Works) In shops : 42262/9, 61397, 65910, 80093, D260, D6142/4/7. Ex Works 45461, 64595. Scrapped in last 4 weeks-44008/253, 47168, 47536, 57331/613, 65313, 69204. Awaiting scrap: 44254, 57378, 64478, 90513. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5461
Built at Crewe Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45461    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
22/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45461    

prev prev