Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 145 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1179 Week
» 23685 Month
» 326875 Year
» 1548440 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5462 m/e 11/1938
British Railways 45462 w/e 12/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
28A Motherwell 4w/e 22/06/1946
28A Motherwell on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 30/03/1946
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5462
Built at Crewe Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
12/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45462    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45462    

prev prev