Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 148 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1182 Week
» 23688 Month
» 326878 Year
» 1548443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5464 m/e 11/1938
British Railways 45464 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/10/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
17A Derby w/e 25/05/1963
16F Burton w/e 12/09/1964
40E Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 22/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16F Burton w/e 12/09/1964
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 22/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender.
Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed
SLS/194807
30/11/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. SLS/195001
09/02/1964 Crewe Works (Works Yard) Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5464
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45464    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
22/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45464    

prev prev