Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 151 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1185 Week
» 23691 Month
» 326881 Year
» 1548446 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5465 m/e 11/1938
British Railways 45465 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal Thu 13/02/1964
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 13/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 13/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 St. Rollox Works Engines into shops: 1131, 2276, 3868, 4884, 7168, 16321, 16329, 17278, 17322, 17367, 17634, 40688, 40924, 42217, 42877, 44701, 44886, 44970, 44976, 44992, 44996, 44997, 45009, 45084, 45125, 45162, 45432, 45453, 45461, 45463. 45465, 45564, 45692, 54480, 54484, 54488, 54491, 55126, 56346, 57329, 57456, 57580, 57592, 57625. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5465
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45465    
13/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45465    

prev prev