Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1041 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2075 Week
» 24581 Month
» 327771 Year
» 1549336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5466 m/e 11/1938
British Railways 45466 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1967
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/08/1952
8C Speke Junction w/e 14/03/1964
8A Edge Hill w/e 20/06/1964
8C Speke Junction w/e 13/02/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 25/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40189, 669, 42212, 42400, 42833, 43996, 44325, 5466, 54456, 54638, 16338, 57618. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5466
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
05/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45466    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
25/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 45466    

prev prev