Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1035 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2069 Week
» 24575 Month
» 327765 Year
» 1549330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5467 m/e 11/1938
British Railways 45467 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 11/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967
Service Life 28 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 02/07/1960
67B Hurlford 4w/e 11/02/1961
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 24/11/1962
67E Dumfries 5w/e 30/05/1964
67C Ayr 4w/e 26/06/1965
66B Motherwell 9w/e 26/11/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford on 13/06/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 4w/e 09/05/1964
ALLOC 67C Ayr 9w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-*40636(4341) 15/7; 40665(3804) 30/6; 40920(3256) 14/6; 40921(4267) 17/6; 41146(3795) 14/7; 41147(3792) 10/6; 41149(4166) 3/6; 41177(3340) 18/6; 41183(3530) 9/7; 42204 26/6; 42215 1/7; 42699 11/6; 42745(4171) 3/8; 42805(4015) 24/6; 42884(4212) 25/5; 42908(4263) 3/6; *42912(4274) 15/7; 43884(2977) 4/7; 44008(3098) 1/7; 44016(3105) 14/7; 44877(10502) 8/7; 44880(10505) 20/6; 44952(10577) 13/7; 44958(10583) 15/6; 44970(10595) 4/7; 44974(10599) 17/6; 45008(9845) 15/7; 45022(9511) 2/7; 45053(9032) 11/6; *45084(9116) 8/7; 45085(9266) 9/7; 45086(9180) 18/6; 45090(9821) 30/6; 45125(9229) 6/7; 45126(9720) 24/6; 45162(9714) 14/7; 45226(9502) 16/6; 45363(9211) 11/7; 45467(9176) 31/5; 45472(9679) 7/6; 45475(9070) 29/6; 45490(9120) 20/6; 45576(9022) 14/6; 45645(9818) 31/5; 45729(9723) 3/6; 47536 22/6; 54491(6191) 3/6; 54506(6212) 11/7; 55126 26/6; 55191 13/6; 55196 15/7; 55219 6/8; 55228 6/7; 55232 8/6; 55240 8/7; 55263 9/7; 55360 22/6; 56269 6/6; 56279 11/6; 56315 23/6; 56327 5/8; 56341 10/6; 56346 15/6; 57245(6058) 5/7; 57264(937) 16/6; 57323(957) 14/7; 57332(6038) 29/6; 57338(1764) 2/8; 57358(1723) 21/6; 57397(1292) 6/7; 57430(6021) 24/6; 57467(1304) 4/8; 57583(1664) 2/7; *57619(1777) 30/6; 57632(1713) 11/7; 57635(1683) 18/6; 57659(1761) 11/6; 57661(1775) 18/6; *57686(1767) 13/7; 57690(1771) 4/6. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. In addition, No. M5359 was re-numbered 45359 on 13/7, tender No. 9060.
Locomotives on Works at commencement of Annual Holiday, 16/7. Erecting Shop: Nos. 908, 1136, 2745, 4234/81, 5047, 5455/57/74/99, 5560, 14464/73, 14639, 15164, 15219, 16327, 17337/38, 17453/67, 17599. Yard: No. 16025 (Works' shunter, awaiting shop repairs).Dump: Nos. 905, M5575, 14448, 14649 (all awaiting shop repairs), 15116 (minus boiler; withdrawn W/E 29/5), 17374 (withdrawn W/E 22/5) and 17422 (minus boiler; agreed for breaking up 7/6). No. 16025 , the Works' 'pug,' burst a tube on 12/7 and No. 17254 (31A) was used as a substitute until the commencement of the Works' Annual Holiday. No. 16025 went into shops for a service repair on 2/8; No. 16030 (31E) having arrived to act as Works' shunter. No. 15116 was towed into the shops ex dump on 2/8 and was cut-up during the ensuing week
SLS/194809
31/03/1950 Inverness Lochgorm Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 44787, 45127, 45467/77, 54471, 56301. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5467
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45467    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
26/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 45467    

prev prev