Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 166 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1200 Week
» 23706 Month
» 326896 Year
» 1548461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5468 m/e 12/1938
British Railways 45468 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1938
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 25 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1938
31A St Rollox (Balornock) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31D Grangemouth w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 65B   w/e 22/10/1949
WDN   on 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5468
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
05/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 45468    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45468    

prev prev