|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. | SLS/195002 |
02/01/1962 | Far North lines | During the snow and frost spell which ended on 2nd January, steam was once more used north of Inverness as the frost seemed to cause trouble with the d/es more than snow. At Wick 45117 had a snowplough attached and at Helmsdale 45470 had a new snowplough attached; at Inverness similarly were 45123, 44799 an 45474. The frost also affected signalling and even couplings; the 11-25 a.m. ex Inverness-Wick on 30th December left 4¼ hrs. late and took over an hour to detach the dining car at Rogart. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1938 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5470 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) | ||
20/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45470 | ||
18/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (60A) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
10/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45470 | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |