Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 121 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5342 Week
» 20456 Month
» 323646 Year
» 1545211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 5470 m/e 12/1938
British Railways 45470 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1938
Withdrawal w/e Thu 10/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 25 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1938
29A Perth South on 01/01/1948
60A Inverness 4w/e 18/11/1961
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/04/1962
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 21/04/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 10/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 60A Inverness 2w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/04/1962
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 5w/e 12/05/1962
ALLOC 67F Stranraer 5w/e 13/10/1962
WDN   w/e 10/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. SLS/195002
02/01/1962 Far North lines During the snow and frost spell which ended on 2nd January, steam was once more used north of Inverness as the frost seemed to cause trouble with the d/es more than snow. At Wick 45117 had a snowplough attached and at Helmsdale 45470 had a new snowplough attached; at Inverness similarly were 45123, 44799 an 45474. The frost also affected signalling and even couplings; the 11-25 a.m. ex Inverness-Wick on 30th December left 4¼ hrs. late and took over an hour to detach the dining car at Rogart. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5470
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45470    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
10/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45470    

prev prev