Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 76 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16638 Month
» 348127 Year
» 424714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5491   12/1943
BR 45491 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/08/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 09/08/1952
WDN   w/e 17/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as LMS Number 5491
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45491    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 45491    

prev prev