Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5592 |
on |
29/12/1934 |
British Railways |
45592 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
29/12/1934 |
INDORE |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5592, name: INDORE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24150 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45592 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45592 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|