Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3017 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17060 Week
» 82014 Month
» 284678 Year
» 3311531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5624 |
on |
19/10/1934 |
British Railways |
45624 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
19/10/1934 |
ST. HELENA |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 19/10/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 23/11/1963 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5624, name: ST. HELENA Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45624 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (6E) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45624 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|