Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1399 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14805 Week
» 67821 Month
» 187348 Year
» 3214201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5679 |
on |
24/12/1935 |
British Railways |
45679 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
24/12/1935 |
ARMADA |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 24/12/1935 to Chester (MR) (6A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/08/1961 |
St. Rollox Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D3005, D3206/78, D3913, D5314/6/7, D6116, 42059, 44877, 44976, 45011/23/49, 45245, 45360, 45679/91. Paint Shop: 44703. Outside Paint Shop: 42805, 45366, 45677. Works Yard: D5309, 44721, 45018, 57617, 57658. Works Shunter: D3342. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5679, name: ARMADA Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45679 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45679 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|