Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4304 Week
» 32262 Month
» 66904 Year
» 1288469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5690   09/03/1936
BR 45690 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/03/1936 LEANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Jubilee
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Mon 09/03/1936
Withdrawal 5w/e Mon 30/03/1964
Service Life 28 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
22A Bristol Barrow Road 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 5w/e 30/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 25/10/1947
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1936 To Service To service as LMS Number 5690, name: LEANDER
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45690    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 45690    

prev prev