|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/09/1949 | Manchester London Road Station | Fowler 2-6-4T No. 42355 was noted at London Road Statlon on 8/9, painted black and fully lined and with the new crest on the tank sides. Class '4M.T.' No. 43042 was noted in similar livery near Broadheath (Altrincham) on the same date. A smart little piece of running was noted on 6/9 by 'Jubilee' No. 5740 Munster. Although arriving at Stockport on time with the 8.35 a.m. ex-Euston, the slow station work here made a three minutes late departure from the latter. Extremely fast and unchecked running resulted in a three minutes early arrival at London Road, Manchester. | SLS/194910 |
15/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/12/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5740, name: MUNSTER Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45740 | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
17/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
01/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
09/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
01/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
23/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45740 | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |