Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
501 |
m/e |
06/1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5722 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25722 |
m/e |
05/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
Prince of Wales |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
5469 |
To Service |
During 06/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/03/1948 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1919 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5C |
|
Stafford |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1919 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 501 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 5469 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5722 |
|
|
05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25722 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25722 |
|
|