Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1557 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5752 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25752 |
m/e |
06/1934 |
British Railways |
58002 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
Prince of Wales |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
5499 |
To Service |
During 11/1919 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1948 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1919 |
5C |
|
Stafford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/08/1947 |
Stafford Station |
On 7/8 'Prince of Wales' No. 25752 was noted here repainted, whilst L.N.E.R. No. 5013 was on the shed. |
SLS/194709 |
11/06/1949 |
The last ex L. & N.W.R. passenger tender locomotive withdrawn |
The withdrawal of 'Precursor' Class 4-4-0 No. 25297 Sirocco during W/E 11/6/49 has rendered the passenger tender locomotives of the former L. & N.W.R. extinct. The two other recent survivors, 'Prince of Wales' Class No. 25752 and 'Claughton' Class No. 6004 were withdrawn during W/E 7/5/49 and 23/4/49 respectively. No. 25297 ran 1,496,387 miles during her working career; No. 6004 893,534 miles and No. 25752 855,602 miles. All three are to be broken up. |
SLS/194908 |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works (Scrap Road) |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1557 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 5499 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5752 |
|
|
06/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25752 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25752 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 58002 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|