Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3578 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16984 Week
» 70000 Month
» 189527 Year
» 3216380 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
557 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5827 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25827 |
m/e |
04/1934 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
Prince of Wales |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Works Number |
236 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/03/1948 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1922 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5C |
|
Stafford |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The first three Caprotti Class '5's' of Order E.469 Nos. 44738-40 were completed on 16/4 (44738 ), 21/4 (44739 ) and 28/4 (44740 ). They are the first of ten Caprotti engines to be equipped with plain bearings. The latest 'Royal Scot' to undergo conversion was No. 6105 which was completed on 9/4, whilst the next two 'Patriot' 4-6-0's to be rebuilt are Nos. 5532 an 5512 (in that order). It is interesting to note that these two engines are to receive new frames, hitherto, of course, all converted 'Patriot' 4-6-0's have had their original frames modified. More ex L.N.W. withdrawn locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently. They were cut up as follows:-W/E 10/4 7946; W/E 17/4 6919, 7709, 25321; W/E 24/4 6728, 6926, 28153; W/E 1/5 9231, 9274, 25827; W/E 8/5 7821, 9250. Several ex W.D. 2-8-0 tenders recently arrived from Swindon. Four of them were fitted to ex L.M.S. 2-8-0's to replace the tenders sent to the Southern Region for use on the ex S.R. locomotives taking part in the exchange trials. Three ex S.R. boilers of the 4-4-0 'Schools' Class recently arrived here for repair, and it is understood that more are to follow. |
SLS/194806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 557 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 236 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5827 |
|
|
04/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25827 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25827 |
|
|