Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4459 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23370 Week
» 88324 Month
» 290988 Year
» 3317841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5845 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25845 |
m/e |
09/1934 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1947 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/11/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Probably the most interesting incident here during the past month was the arrival on 19/10 of ex C.R. 0-4-OST No. 16032, bearing a 31E shed plate. The engine arrived on a well-wagon, minus its wheels and motion. These were conveyed separately and subsequently assembled in the Erecting Shop. The engine has now joined the ranks of the Works' shunting locos. Since the completion of Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 4763 on 9/10, only one other engine has appeared; No. 4764 which was completed on 7/11. Of the remaining three engines of the present Order (E.467), Nos. 4765/66 were in an advanced state of completion on 7/11. These two engines are the first of six Class '5's' to be equipped with double chimneys and electric lighting. The current will be supplied by a turbo-generator mounted on a small bracket, approximately nine inches above the 'foot-framing,' on the right-hand side of the smokebox, behind the main steam pipe. Further '8F' 2-8-0's converted to oil-burning are: Nos.8064, 8269, 8370 an 8606, which were completed on 21/10, 20/10, 31/10 and 27/10 respectively. The following ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have been cut up since 11/10: 6627 (W/E 8/11), 6703 (W/E 1/11), 7755 (W/E 25/10), 7823 (W/E 18110), 27618 (W/E 25/10), 27640 (W/E 1/11), 28240 (W/E 18/10), 28369 (W/E 1/11), 28423 (W/E 8/11), 28482 (W/E 18/10), 28538 (W/E 8/11). Ex L.N.W.R. 'Prince of Wales' Class 4-6-0 No. 25845 has been withdrawn from service, and was observed in the Works' yard on 6/11 in a deplorable condition. |
SLS/194712 |
07/12/1947 |
Crewe Works Scrapyard |
The Scrap line consisted of Nos. 9118, 9215, 9380, 27663, 6725, 7944, 25845, 28288, an 28315. |
SLS/194801 |
31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5845 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
|
|
09/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25845 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25845 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|