Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18969 Week
» 71985 Month
» 191512 Year
» 3218365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6161 |
on |
08/09/1930 |
British Railways |
46161 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
08/09/1930 |
KING'S OWN |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
7P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 08/09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/11/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1947 |
Crewe Works |
'Patriot' 5X Class engines rebuilt to date have been dealt with in the following order: Nos. 5530/21/26/14. The latter went into traffic on 26/3. The 'Princess Coronation' 4-6-2 which have had the streamline casing removed since January 1st are Nos. 6241/37/25 (in that order). Locos. to receive the new standard livery recently include: Nos. 5538, 5591, 5639, 5684, 5706, 5708, 6110, 6118, 6121, 6127, 6134, 6135, 6139, 6147, 6161, 6202 and 6211. No. 6202 has had a complete general repair and it is understood that it will only be a matter of weeks before she appears on the Western Division again. Construction of new Class 5 4-6-0's has begun again and the first engine, No. 4768 of Order No. E466 was completed on 27/3. |
SLS/194705 |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
27/02/1961 |
Birmingham |
With reference to the diversion of the 4.25 p.m. Euston -Wolverhampton via the Stour Valley line between Birmingham and Wolverhampton since Pacifics were rostered to this train; from 27th February, Class 7s commenced duty on this train, 45527, 46114/61/7 being allocated to Bushbury to cover a three-day diagram. By coincidence authority was given only the previous week for Class 8s to work between Wolverhampton no. 1 and Portobello Junction (on the Grand Junction line) subject to a speed restriction over Inkerman St. bridge at Heath Town Junction; this route was used on Sunday, 26th Feb., when Wolverhampton-Birmingham trains were diverted from the Stour Valley line via Bescot and Soho Rd., and at least one Pacific was noted. |
SLS/196104 |
01/05/1961 |
Birmingham |
Since 1st May, all London trains have been rostered to EE diesels (except the 12-25 p.m. Watford-B'ham) and Bushbury Class 7s have been relegated to other duties, although 46161 worked the 9-42 a.m. Wolverhampton-Euston (and 4-10 p.m. return) on 8th May. D2387 (transferred from Sutton Oak) has had spells at Monument 1Ane, Aston, Bescot and Bushbury sheds and is due to return to Monument 1Ane which is to have three of the class for use on Albion, Monument 1Ane shunts and the Harborne branch. 58271 has been working the 1Atter branch and is due for boiler inspection in July; however, it is expected that Monument 1Ane will be completely dieselised by June. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6161, name: KING'S OWN Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46161 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
26/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46161 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|