Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 143 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4958 Week
» 11092 Month
» 238976 Year
» 1460541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6202 on 29/06/1935
BR 46202   12/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/08/1952 PRINCESS ANNE

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LMS Red   29/06/1935
LMS Black   05/1947
BR Black Red and White 03/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 08/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Princess Royal
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Turbomotive29/06/1935
Princess Anne15/08/1952
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 29/06/1935 to Camden (1B)
Withdrawal Sat 22/05/1954 off Crewe North (5A)
Total Mileage 470,215
Scrapping Sat 22/05/1954 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LMS 9t Riveted 9003 29/06/1935 LMS 4,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Badly damaged in the Harrow and Wealdstone disaster on 8th October, 1952
After Harrow and Wealdstone, the repaired tender ended up behind 8F 48134

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1B Camden (New) 29/06/1935
8A Edge Hill 22/02/1936
1B Camden 19/04/1936
5A Crewe North 16/09/1939
1B Camden 09/08/1941
5A Crewe North 27/06/1953
   Withdrawn 22/05/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   w/e 22/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401
31/03/1947 Crewe Works 'Patriot' 5X Class engines rebuilt to date have been dealt with in the following order: Nos. 5530/21/26/14. The latter went into traffic on 26/3. The 'Princess Coronation' 4-6-2 which have had the streamline casing removed since January 1st are Nos. 6241/37/25 (in that order). Locos. to receive the new standard livery recently include: Nos. 5538, 5591, 5639, 5684, 5706, 5708, 6110, 6118, 6121, 6127, 6134, 6135, 6139, 6147, 6161, 6202 and 6211. No. 6202 has had a complete general repair and it is understood that it will only be a matter of weeks before she appears on the Western Division again. Construction of new Class 5 4-6-0's has begun again and the first engine, No. 4768 of Order No. E466 was completed on 27/3. SLS/194705
30/09/1947 Crewe Works Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. SLS/194710
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905
08/12/1952 Harrow Disaster Meanwhile, work had been proceeding on 46202 also. The tender, which had been cleared of coal on another occasion, was dealt with first. This was not so badly damaged and was got away with the top sides and frame each on a Rectank wagon by 8.15 a.m. At 10.50 a.m. the task of lifting the large boiler was commenced, and by 11.30 a.m. it has been safely loaded or to a 40-ton Flatroll wagon. Work went on throughout the day loading up the other wagons with various parts which had either been knocked off at the time of the collisions or cut off later, until ultimately a small trainload departed at 9.30 p.m. behind 45282, in the direction of Watford. The Rugby crane left about the same time behind 48122, both engines having been assisting the operations along with 48601. The Willesden crane left about 10.0 p.m., and all that remained were the frames and two rear pairs only of the driving wheels, the leading pair having earlier been removed and put in a wagon. The frames had been attached to a large tender off an express engine, in good condition, by means of a long heavy timbered coupling. What was left of Princess Anne departed thus on her own wheels in the early hours of Monday morning, 10th November. The electric lines were open for traffic at the normal time and the line in the siding, which had been out of use since 8th October, brought into use again. Fortunately, the weather remained fine throughout the week-end. On Sunday, 16th November, a very similar operation was carried out in respect of the other engine, 46242, City of Glasgow. This had been removed from the main line on Saturday, 11th, in a terrible condition and placed in a siding in the goods yard on the Up side of the line, in the Watford direction. No interference with ordinary traffic was necessary for this, as the cranes could use an adjacent track. The same procedure was followed, the boiler being removed and loaded on one wagon, with the frame on another and wheels in Opens. This engine was damaged much more than 46202, the frame being nothing but a twisted mass of scrap, whilst the front of the boiler had been forced right back, exposing all the tubes. Whatever may be decided as to the future of engines bearing these numbers, it seems clear from their condition that the existing engines will never run again. SLS/195306

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Crewe Works 24/09/1935 21/12/1935 89 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 15/01/1936 04/02/1936 21 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 15/05/1936 24/06/1936 41 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 14/07/1936 31/07/1936 18 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 28/01/1937 13/04/1937 76 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 20/10/1937 11/11/1937 23 days TRO  
Crewe Works 29/11/1937 16/12/1937 18 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 02/06/1938 24/10/1938 145 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 08/02/1939 31/07/1939 174 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 17/07/1941 14/07/1942 363 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 01/08/1942 08/08/1942 8 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 21/11/1942 09/01/1943 50 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 11/06/1943 22/09/1944 470 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 18/12/1944 18/01/1945 32 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 12/04/1945 01/06/1945 51 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 12/07/1945 25/07/1945 14 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 09/03/1946 08/04/1947 396 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 16/08/1947 09/09/1947 25 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 23/09/1947 12/10/1947 20 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 05/12/1947 03/01/1948 30 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 16/04/1948 10/03/1949 329 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 13/06/1949 22/06/1949 10 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 27/09/1949 14/12/1949 79 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 21/12/1949 17/01/1950 28 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 18/02/1950 23/02/1950 6 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 17/03/1950 13/04/1950 28 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 06/05/1950 15/08/1952 833 days Heavy General
Rebuilt to "Princess Anne" class
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
Named PRINCESS ANNE
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6202
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number
Allocated to Camden (1B)
Livery applied: LMS lined red
Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted
   
24/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 24/09/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.    
15/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/01/1936. Dep: 04/02/1936.    
22/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
19/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
15/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/05/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936.    
14/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 14/07/1936. Dep: 31/07/1936.    
28/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 28/01/1937. Dep: 13/04/1937.    
20/10/1937 Works Visit      
29/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 29/11/1937. Dep: 16/12/1937.    
02/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 02/06/1938. Dep: 24/10/1938.    
08/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 08/02/1939. Dep: 31/07/1939.    
16/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
17/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 17/07/1941. Dep: 14/07/1942.    
09/08/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
01/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942.    
21/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 21/11/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.    
11/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/06/1943. Dep: 22/09/1944.    
18/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/12/1944. Dep: 18/01/1945.    
12/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 12/04/1945. Dep: 01/06/1945.    
12/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 12/07/1945. Dep: 25/07/1945.    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 08/04/1947.    
16/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 09/09/1947.    
23/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 23/09/1947. Dep: 12/10/1947.    
05/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 05/12/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948.    
16/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 10/03/1949.    
03/1949 Livery Change of livery to Black (Lining: Red and White)    
12/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46202    
13/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1949. Dep: 22/06/1949.    
27/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/09/1949. Dep: 14/12/1949.    
21/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1949. Dep: 17/01/1950.    
18/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 23/02/1950.    
17/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 17/03/1950. Dep: 13/04/1950.    
06/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/05/1950. Dep: 15/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to "Princess Anne" class
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
Named PRINCESS ANNE
   
08/1952 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
27/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
22/05/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 46202 from Crewe North (5A)    

prev prev