Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6203   01/07/1935
BR 46203   22/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/07/1935 PRINCESS MARGARET ROSE

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LMS Red   01/07/1935
LMS Black   12/1947
BR Blue Black and White 05/1951
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Princess Royal
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 01/07/1935 to Camden (1B)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/10/1962 off Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LMS 9t Riveted 9124 01/07/1935 LMS 4,000g 9t 0cwt
LMS 10t Riveted 9374 19/01/1937 LMS 4,000g 10t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Preserved - Sold to Messrs. Butlin's Ltd, April 1963

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1B Camden (New) 01/07/1935
27A Polmadie 24/08/1935
1B Camden 29/02/1936
8A Edge Hill 21/10/1939
7C Holyhead 06/04/1940
5A Crewe North 28/09/1940
7C Holyhead 02/11/1940
8A Edge Hill 09/11/1940
1B Camden 26/12/1942
8A Edge Hill 03/04/1943
5A Crewe North (on loan) 09/10/1943
5A Crewe North 27/11/1943
8A Edge Hill 20/05/1944
5A Crewe North (on loan) 18/10/1947
8A Edge Hill 14/02/1948
66A Polmadie 22/09/1951
8A Edge Hill 16/05/1953
5A Crewe North 23/05/1953
8A Edge Hill 20/09/1958
1B Camden 20/08/1960
8A Edge Hill 10/09/1960
24L Carnforth 11/03/1961
5A Crewe North 18/07/1961
24L Carnforth 09/09/1961
12B Carlisle Upperby 27/01/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 07/04/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 18/10/1947
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 14/02/1948
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/10/1951
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 1B Camden 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/04/1961
TOSTORE 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/04/1961
REINS 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1961
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 20/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/09/1957 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
13/06/1959 Speedometer fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Crewe Works 19/03/1936 06/04/1936 19 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 08/04/1936 15/04/1936 8 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 15/06/1936 19/06/1936 5 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 06/08/1936 17/08/1936 12 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 30/11/1936 19/01/1937 51 days Heavy General
Tender number 9374 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached.
 
Crewe Works 05/08/1937 10/09/1937 37 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 29/11/1937 13/12/1937 15 days Light Repair  
Crewe Works 12/11/1938 12/02/1939 93 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 28/12/1939 13/01/1940 17 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 24/09/1940 12/10/1940 19 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 25/01/1941 22/02/1941 29 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 15/11/1941 20/12/1941 36 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 20/03/1942 16/04/1942 28 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 13/11/1942 15/12/1942 33 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 27/07/1943 18/08/1943 23 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 21/09/1943 30/09/1943 10 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 11/06/1944 26/09/1944 108 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 28/05/1945 30/06/1945 34 days Heavy Service  
Crewe Works 26/10/1945 16/11/1945 22 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 24/12/1945 09/02/1946 48 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 29/07/1946 07/09/1946 41 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 18/01/1947 19/08/1947 214 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 28/02/1947 20/03/1947 21 days Light Ordinary  
Crewe Works 18/09/1947 08/12/1947 82 days Heavy General
Painted
 
Crewe Works 26/02/1948 05/05/1948 70 days Heavy Ordinary  
Crewe Works 16/11/1948 23/12/1948 38 days Light Service  
Crewe Works 18/02/1949 13/05/1949 85 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 05/08/1949 15/09/1949 42 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 16/10/1949 28/10/1949 13 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 03/06/1950 03/07/1950 31 days Light Intermediate  
Crewe Works 17/04/1951 24/05/1951 38 days Heavy General
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Derby Works 13/11/1951 17/03/1952 126 days Heavy Intermediate
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Crewe Works 04/04/1952 04/04/1952 1 day Non Classified  
Crewe Works 08/04/1952 10/04/1952 3 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 29/04/1953 15/05/1953 17 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 20/08/1953 24/09/1953 36 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 29/10/1953 04/12/1953 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Crewe Works 22/02/1954 19/03/1954 26 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 08/09/1954 16/10/1954 39 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 19/08/1955 19/10/1955 62 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 29/10/1955 10/11/1955 13 days Non Classified
Rectification work
 
Crewe Works 10/02/1956 13/03/1956 33 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 28/10/1956 21/12/1956 55 days Heavy Intermediate  
Crewe Works 01/06/1957 03/08/1957 64 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 23/09/1957 26/09/1957 4 days Non Classified  
Crewe Works 18/10/1957 07/12/1957 51 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 13/06/1958 14/08/1958 63 days Heavy General  
Crewe Works 13/04/1959 22/05/1959 40 days Light Casual  
Crewe Works 09/09/1959 06/11/1959 59 days Heavy Intermediate  
Crewe Works 14/06/1960 12/08/1960 60 days Heavy Casual  
Crewe Works 29/11/1960 09/02/1961 73 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1935 To Service To service as LMS Number 6203, name: PRINCESS MARGARET ROSE
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number
Allocated to Camden (1B)
Livery applied: LMS lined red
Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted
   
24/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (27A)    
29/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
19/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 19/03/1936. Dep: 06/04/1936.    
08/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 08/04/1936. Dep: 15/04/1936.    
15/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/06/1936. Dep: 19/06/1936.    
06/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 06/08/1936. Dep: 17/08/1936.    
30/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/11/1936. Dep: 19/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 9374 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached.
   
05/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 10/09/1937.    
29/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1937. Dep: 13/12/1937.    
12/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 12/02/1939.    
21/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
28/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 28/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.    
06/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
24/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 24/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.    
28/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
02/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
09/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.    
15/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941.    
20/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 16/04/1942.    
13/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 15/12/1942.    
26/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 18/08/1943.    
21/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 21/09/1943. Dep: 30/09/1943.    
09/10/1943 Allocation Loaned to Crewe North (5A)    
27/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
20/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/06/1944. Dep: 26/09/1944.    
28/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 28/05/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.    
26/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/10/1945. Dep: 16/11/1945.    
24/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 24/12/1945. Dep: 09/02/1946.    
29/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 29/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 19/08/1947.    
28/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 28/02/1947. Dep: 20/03/1947.    
18/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/09/1947. Dep: 08/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted
   
18/10/1947 Allocation Loaned to Crewe North (5A)    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
26/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 26/02/1948. Dep: 05/05/1948.    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46203    
16/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948.    
18/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 13/05/1949.    
05/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1949. Dep: 15/09/1949.    
16/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 16/10/1949. Dep: 28/10/1949.    
03/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 03/07/1950.    
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 24/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
13/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1951. Dep: 17/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
04/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 04/04/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952.    
08/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 08/04/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
29/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1953. Dep: 15/05/1953.    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
23/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
20/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953.    
29/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953.    
22/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954.    
08/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.    
19/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/08/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955.    
29/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 29/10/1955. Dep: 10/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rectification work
   
10/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956.    
28/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956.    
01/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957.    
07/09/1957 Modification Modification: Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted    
23/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 26/09/1957.    
18/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957.    
13/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/06/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958.    
20/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
13/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959.    
13/06/1959 Modification Modification: Speedometer fitted    
09/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959.    
14/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960.    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
29/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1960. Dep: 09/02/1961.    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
18/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
20/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 46203 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    

prev prev