|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crewe Works | 31/01/1936 | 21/02/1936 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 15/06/1936 | 17/06/1936 | 3 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 29/06/1936 | 03/07/1936 | 5 days | Light Ordinary | Tender number 9344 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 02/08/1936 | 20/08/1936 | 19 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 07/03/1937 | 06/05/1937 | 61 days | Heavy General | Tender number 9353 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 16/10/1937 | 01/11/1937 | 17 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 17/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 32 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 18/03/1938 | 02/05/1938 | 46 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 11/08/1938 | 02/09/1938 | 23 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 04/06/1939 | 18/07/1939 | 45 days | Light Service | Tender number 9360 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
Crewe Works | 28/03/1940 | 03/05/1940 | 37 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 06/03/1941 | 05/04/1941 | 31 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 15/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 27 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 19/01/1942 | 07/02/1942 | 20 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 26/03/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 31 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 10/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 24 days | Heavy Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 02/02/1943 | 18/03/1943 | 45 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 27/07/1943 | 03/09/1943 | 39 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 02/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 38 days | Light Service | |||
Crewe Works | 01/01/1945 | 13/01/1945 | 13 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 12/07/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 94 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 05/11/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 27 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 06/12/1945 | 27/12/1945 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 14/01/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 48 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 05/04/1946 | 26/04/1946 | 22 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 07/09/1946 | 10/10/1946 | 34 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 14/01/1947 | 20/02/1947 | 38 days | Heavy Service | |||
Crewe Works | 18/08/1947 | 02/09/1947 | 16 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 10/09/1947 | 24/10/1947 | 45 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 17/03/1948 | 18/05/1948 | 63 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 11/09/1948 | 15/10/1948 | 35 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Crewe Works | 11/05/1949 | 21/06/1949 | 42 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 07/1950 | 22/09/1950 | Heavy General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
|||
Crewe Works | 14/08/1951 | 19/09/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 13/10/1951 | 16/11/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 23/07/1952 | 06/11/1952 | 107 days | Heavy General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Crewe Works | 20/05/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 10/11/1954 | 15/12/1954 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 26/10/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Crewe Works | 21/02/1956 | 20/03/1956 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 04/04/1956 | 28/04/1956 | 25 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 20/02/1957 | 03/04/1957 | 43 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 11/04/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 8 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 18/09/1957 | 22/10/1957 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 20/02/1958 | 02/04/1958 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 13/08/1958 | 24/09/1958 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
Crewe Works | 08/12/1958 | 20/01/1959 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 22/09/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 12 days | Non Classified | Speedometer fitted |
||
Crewe Works | 12/11/1959 | 13/01/1960 | 63 days | Heavy General | |||
Crewe Works | 17/05/1960 | 18/05/1960 | 2 days | Non Classified | |||
Crewe Works | 29/05/1960 | 02/09/1960 | 97 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Crewe Works | 30/10/1960 | 29/12/1960 | 61 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1961 | \"Princess Royal\'s\" in store | LMSR 'Princess Royal' Class Pacifics-further to the information in the Locomotive Stock alterations, these engines are in store as follows-Edge Hill (8A)-46200/4/8/9/12, Carnforth (24L)-46203/11, Kingmoor (12A) -46201/10, Willesden (1A)-46205/7 and Rugby (2A)-46206. At least one (46207) is only a few weeks out of shops and it is expected that all will be back in traffic during the Summer Service. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6208, name: PRINCESS HELENA VICTORIA Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: LMS lined red Tender fitted: LMS 9t Riveted |
||
31/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
31/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 31/01/1936. Dep: 21/02/1936. | ||
15/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 15/06/1936. Dep: 17/06/1936. | ||
29/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 29/06/1936. Dep: 03/07/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 9344 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
02/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 02/08/1936. Dep: 20/08/1936. | ||
07/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/03/1937. Dep: 06/05/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 9353 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 01/11/1937. | ||
17/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 17/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. | ||
18/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 18/03/1938. Dep: 02/05/1938. | ||
16/07/1938 | Allocation | Loaned to Crewe North (5A) | ||
06/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
11/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 11/08/1938. Dep: 02/09/1938. | ||
04/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 04/06/1939. Dep: 18/07/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 9360 (LMS 10t Riveted) attached. |
||
21/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
28/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/03/1940. Dep: 03/05/1940. | ||
08/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
10/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
06/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 06/03/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941. | ||
15/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 15/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. | ||
19/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 19/01/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942. | ||
26/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 26/03/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. | ||
10/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Ordinary) - Arr: 10/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 18/03/1943. | ||
27/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 03/09/1943. | ||
02/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Service) - Arr: 02/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
01/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/01/1945. Dep: 13/01/1945. | ||
12/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. | ||
05/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 05/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
06/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 06/12/1945. Dep: 27/12/1945. | ||
14/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 14/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. | ||
05/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 05/04/1946. Dep: 26/04/1946. | ||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 10/10/1946. | ||
14/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Service) - Arr: 14/01/1947. Dep: 20/02/1947. | ||
18/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 18/08/1947. Dep: 02/09/1947. | ||
10/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 10/09/1947. Dep: 24/10/1947. | ||
17/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/03/1948. Dep: 18/05/1948. | ||
22/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46208 | ||
11/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 11/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948. | ||
11/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 21/06/1949. | ||
07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: ?/07/1950. Dep: 22/09/1950. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
14/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 19/09/1951. | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951. | ||
23/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/07/1952. Dep: 06/11/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
11/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. | ||
10/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 15/12/1954. | ||
26/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. | ||
21/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956. | ||
04/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 28/04/1956. | ||
20/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/02/1957. Dep: 03/04/1957. | ||
11/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 11/04/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. | ||
18/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1957. Dep: 22/10/1957. | ||
02/11/1957 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 02/04/1958. | ||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 24/09/1958. Work undertaken: Painted Standard BR red for steam locomotives |
||
09/1958 | Livery | Change of livery to Standard BR red for steam locomotives | ||
08/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 20/01/1959. | ||
22/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/09/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. Work undertaken: Speedometer fitted |
||
12/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/11/1959. Dep: 13/01/1960. | ||
17/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 18/05/1960. | ||
29/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1960. Dep: 02/09/1960. | ||
30/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1960. Dep: 29/12/1960. | ||
20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46208 from Edge Hill (8A) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |