31/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class '5' 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4761 (25/9), 4762 (2/10) and 4763 (9/10). Work has not yet started on the next 'Royal Scot' conversion (No. 6162), but the next two 'Patriot' rebuilds (Nos. 5540 and 5531) are receiving attention; the former will be completed by the end of October. Two further Class '7' 4-6-2's have had the streamline casing removed, viz.: Nos. 6228 (w/e 27/9) and 6245 (w/e 4/10), thus leaving only four streamlined 'Pacifics' on the L.M.S.: Nos. 6226, 6229, 6236 an 6243. The number of withdrawn locos. lying in the Works has been further reduced. The following engines have been cut up since 20/9: Nos. 6748 (w/e 12/10), 6650 (w/e 27/9), 6685 (w/e 27/9), 6704 (w/e 11/10), 6660 (w/e 4/10) and 25841 (w/e 4/10). The conversion of '8F' 2-8-0 No. 8653 to oil-burning was completed on 14/10 and No. 8606 will be similarly dealt with. 'Patriot' Class: No. 5518 now has the nameplates Bradshaw uncovered. 'Royal Scot' Class: No. 6144 has had its name restored after running without it continuously since well before the war. |
SLS/194711 |
13/12/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Another 'Pacific' has had the streamline casing removed, viz.: No. 6229, during the w/e 13/12/47; No. 6236 will probably be the next to be dealt with. |
SLS/194801 |
29/02/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The first two engines of Order E 468, Nos. 4748 and 4749 , were completed on 15/1 and 6/2 respectively. They are the first of ten engines to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear together with roller-bearing axle-boxes. The appearance of these engines differs somewhat from that of the previous Class '5' 4-6-0's, the most outstanding features being a lowered foot-framing, involving the use of splashers over the coupled wheels, and the main steam pipes, which, set well forward, are coupled to the front end of each steam chest. The camshaft is driven from a gearbox mounted on the leading coupled axle, between the frames. This is connected, by means of a universal shaft, to the cross-driving gearbox, which, situated beneath the smokebox saddle, imparts rotary motion direct to the camshaft. A small instruction plate inside the cab advises drivers to work the engine with a fully-open regulator varying the cut-off to suit gradients, etc. No. 4748 underwent trials on 4/2. One more Class '7P' 4-6-2 has had the streamline casing removed, this was No. *6236 during w/e 7/2 (*This now leaves only two (Nos. 6226/43) to be dealt with). No. 6229, which had the, streamline casing removed in 12/47, went into traffic early in January, in standard .L.M.S. livery, but with a blank tender side. Since then, however, all newly-painted locomotives have had 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' painted on the tender side and the prefix 'M' added, above the number on the cab side, and also beside the number on the smokebox door. All numerals and letters are in a new Gill Sans style, unlined. Several locomotives have already been experimentally painted in various colours. Among these were L.M.S. Class '5' 4-6-0's Nos. 4762-4 and 5292 , painted S.R. green, L.N.E.R. green, G.W.R. green, and black respectively. All four engines were lined on the left-hand side only, the lining on each engine being standard with that used by the pre-nationalised company represented. The style of lining applied to No. 5292 is reminiscent of L. & N.W.R. livery; this engine has since returned to Works, and has been lined on the right-hand side also. These four locomotives were noted at Crewe on the evening of 28/1, apparently just off Works, but they have since been seen in regular service. The number of withdrawn locomotives standing, in the Works' yard has been further reduced. Engines recently cut up include Nos. 9206, 25694, 28343 W/E 17/1, and Nos. 9374, 28546/50 , W/E 24/1 |
SLS/194803 |
31/05/1948 |
Locomotive Trials 1948 |
No. 60034 Lord Faringdon was the ex L.N.E.R. 'A4' 'Pacific' used in the trials on the Euston-Carlisle section, and on all four down trips was observed on time at Crewe. The two ex L.M.S. locomotives to be tested between Waterloo and Exeter are to be equipped with ex W.D. 5000 gallon tenders. Class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 46236 is to receive tender No. 79294 and Class '6P' 4-6-0 No. 46154 tender No. 79254. Both tenders are believed to have come from Swindon |
SLS/194807 |
09/08/1951 |
Rugby Station |
61353 noted being worked back north coupled to 46236. |
SLS/195109 |
31/12/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. |
SLS/196202 |
04/02/1962 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. |
SLS/196203 |