Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 823 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2731 Week
» 18929 Month
» 183829 Year
» 694931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D449 11/12/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50049 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Defiance 02/05/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 11/12/1968
Withdrawn 01/08/1991
Withdrawal Reason Due major exam
Time in Service 22 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 11/12/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/08/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1968 To Service To service as D449
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50049    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
02/05/1978 Naming Named 'Defiance' at Laira    
01/08/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 50049    

prev