Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 927 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14333 Week
» 67349 Month
» 186876 Year
» 3213729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
2164 |
on |
30/01/1907 |
Great Western Railway |
4503 |
on |
28/12/1912 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
30/01/1907 |
SBZ |
|
St Blazey |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/01/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LA |
Laira |
4w/e |
19/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
SBZ |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
17/05/1947 |
WDN |
83E |
St Blazey |
on |
29/01/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2164 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4503 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Blazey (SBZ) |
|
|
29/01/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4503 |
|
|