Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1972 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15378 Week
» 68394 Month
» 187921 Year
» 3214774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
2182 |
m/e |
03/1909 |
Great Western Railway |
4521 |
on |
28/12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
45xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
174 |
Works Number |
2311 |
To Service |
During 03/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/12/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,026,043 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2182 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2311 |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4521 |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Moorswater (la) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
05/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4521 |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|