Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4173 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17579 Week
» 70595 Month
» 190122 Year
» 3216975 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4544 |
m/e |
11/1914 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
45xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
201 |
Works Number |
2601 |
To Service |
During 11/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 25/09/1952 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1914 |
SDN |
|
Swindon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
82A |
|
Bristol Bath Road |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/09/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4544 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2601 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
25/09/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4544 |
|
|