|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. | SLS/194604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4547 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2604 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
26/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (83G) | ||
06/1957 | Report | Report: A report that ex-Taff Vale 0-6-2 tank No. 361 had been installed at Newton Abbot as a stationary boiler is claimed as an error by another reader; the engine did in fact go to Newton Abbot, he writes, but for the reason that her boiler was to be transferred there to 2-6-2 tank No. 4547, which was in need of a new one. No. 4547, incidentally, is unusual in that it has never seen black livery ; it was still G.W. green when overhauled and is now in the new green livery. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4547 | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |