Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 34 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 34 Week
» 14291 Month
» 242175 Year
» 1463740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4555 m/e 09/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 45xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 226
To Service During 09/1924
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1924
82D Westbury 4w/e 05/10/1957
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 05/09/1959
83E St Blazey 4w/e 24/03/1962
83D Laira 4w/e 19/05/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 19/05/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/02/1958 Frome On Sunday, 16th February, the allocation here was 3614, 3735, 4606/36/47, 4555, 7748 an 9615. SLS/195803
28/01/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1924 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4555
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4555    

prev prev