Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 69 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4926 Week
» 16631 Month
» 348120 Year
» 424707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4588   03/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1937
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry 4w/e 24/01/1959
83G Penzance 4w/e 21/03/1959
83B Taunton 4w/e 07/10/1961
83D Laira 4w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 4588
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4588    

prev prev