Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16293 Week
» 69309 Month
» 188836 Year
» 3215689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4590 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
242 |
To Service |
During 03/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/10/1958 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1927 |
SDN |
|
Swindon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
83D |
|
Laira |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4590 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
24/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4590 |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|