Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1370 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14776 Week
» 67792 Month
» 187319 Year
» 3214172 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4596 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
242 |
To Service |
During 04/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/09/1957 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Total Mileage |
723,339 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4596 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
16/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4596 |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|