Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1154 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14560 Week
» 67576 Month
» 187103 Year
» 3213956 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4597 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
242 |
To Service |
During 04/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/01/1958 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4597 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
27/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4597 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|