Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1200 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19003 Week
» 72019 Month
» 191546 Year
» 3218399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4599 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
242 |
To Service |
During 04/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/03/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4599 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
13/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4599 |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|