Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 741 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5315 Week
» 33273 Month
» 67915 Year
» 1289480 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4609 m/e 01/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1942
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RDG Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 05/11/1949
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 31/08/1963
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RDGw Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 4609
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4609    

prev prev