Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 255 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 255 Week
» 34830 Month
» 104309 Year
» 1325874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4610 m/e 02/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1942
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 26/01/1957
73H Dover Marine w/e 11/03/1959
70B Feltham 2w/e 10/10/1961
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/06/1963
72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 26/01/1957
LOAN 73H Dover Marine 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/06/1963
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 4610
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (73H)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4610    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev