Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4612   02/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1942
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 23 yrs , 6 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83B Taunton 4w/e 20/05/1961
82C Swindon 4w/e 27/01/1962
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/09/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 03/11/1962
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SDN Swindon 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 11/07/1965
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 4612
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4612    

prev prev