Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 248 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 248 Week
» 34823 Month
» 104302 Year
» 1325867 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4618 m/e 04/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1942
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/12/1950
88C Barry 4w/e 27/12/1958
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/03/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 04/05/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry m/e 31/01/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 4618
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4618    

prev prev