Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 155 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17958 Week
» 70974 Month
» 190501 Year
» 3217354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4620 |
on |
28/05/1942 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
330 |
To Service |
Wed 28/05/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/07/1965 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4620 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
31/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (LTS) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
21/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4620 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|