Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4661 |
on |
26/10/1943 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Mon 26/10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/12/1963 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
26/10/1943 |
RDG |
|
Reading (W.R.) |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
82D |
|
Westbury |
4w/e |
06/04/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/12/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82D |
Westbury |
4w/e |
06/04/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4661 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4661 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|