Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 325 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18128 Week
» 71144 Month
» 190671 Year
» 3217524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4667 |
on |
22/12/1943 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Mon 22/12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
22/12/1943 |
PDN |
|
Old Oak Common |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/04/1949 |
88C |
|
Barry |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/04/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4667 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4667 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|