Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 692 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14735 Week
» 79689 Month
» 282353 Year
» 3309206 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4672 |
on |
01/03/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Sun 01/03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 07/07/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/01/1959 |
Western Region panniers |
The batch of 34XX panniers ex-store at Barry are now at Radyr except 3400(84G), and 3405/6 88C. They have replaced 4601/10/6/26/30/4/72/86 which have been modified for work on the S.R. and are now re-allocated to Dover and Folkestone. |
SLS/195903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4672 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
01/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
07/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4672 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|