Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 661 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4177 Week
» 32135 Month
» 66777 Year
» 1288342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4673   10/03/1944

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 10/03/1944
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83F Truro 4w/e 16/07/1960
83B Taunton 4w/e 24/03/1962
83C Exeter 4w/e 16/06/1962
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
83C Westbury 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965
83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 83C Exeter m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 83C Westbury 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as GWR Number 4673
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (83C)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4673    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    

prev prev