Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15032 Week
» 68048 Month
» 187575 Year
» 3214428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4693 |
on |
26/01/1945 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
352 |
To Service |
Mon 26/01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4693 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4693 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|